This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/20/2022 at 05:03:28 (UTC).

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. vs. James D Carson

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James D Carson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3942

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Defendant

Carson, James D

Houston, TX 77018-3043

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Teal, Amber

P.O.Box 3790

Lubbock, TX 79464

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amber Teal