Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/05/2018 at 07:00:46 (UTC).

Jose T Da Silva Dba Cc 's Cafe vs. Behaviorial Hospital of Bellaire, Maxim Management Group

Case Summary

On 09/08/2011 Jose T Da Silva Dba Cc 's Cafe filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Behaviorial Hospital of Bellaire, Maxim Management Group. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1750

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose T Da Silva Dba Cc's Cafe

Tomball, TX 77375

Defendants

Behaviorial Hospital of Bellaire

5314 Dashwood Drive Ste 200

Houston, TX 77081

Maxim Management Group

7920 Beltline Rd 700

Dallas, TX 75254

Not Classified By Court

Harris, Mark

Nekic, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Pullen, Eric A

2161 Nw Military Highway 400

San Antonio, TX 78213

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2012
  • Release of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2012
  • Notice-Trial Setting 503.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2011
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2011
  • Answer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2011
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Judgment: Parties For: Jose T Da Silva Dba Cc's Cafe; Parties Against: Behaviorial Hospital of Bellaire and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $5999.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Maxim Management Group, Inc. is a litigant