This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 04/20/2021 at 04:13:33 (UTC).

Jessica Molina, Juan Cortezvs.Ruben Guzman, Octavia Guzman

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Jessica Molina, Juan Cortezvs Ruben Guzman, Octavia Guzman was filed as a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8412

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Molina, Jessica

Houston, TX 77009

Cortez, Juan

Houston, TX 77009

Defendants

Guzman, Octavia

Houston, TX 77038

Guzman, Ruben

Houston, TX 77038

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fleurinord, Kia R

11111 Katy Freeway Suite 910

Houston, TX 77079

Defendant Attorney

Nguyen, Vy Thuan

5177 Richmond Ave Suite 738

Houston, TX 77056

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Mon Jan 25 12:00:00 CST 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • HearingHearing: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketStatement of Inability to Afford Paymnt of Court Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nguyen, Vy Thuan