This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/16/2023 at 05:16:47 (UTC).

Jerome Barnett vs. Karnell LeBlanc

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Jerome Barnett filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Karnell LeBlanc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9656

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barnett, Jerome

Houston, TX 77004

Defendant

LeBlanc, Karnell

Houston, TX 77026

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Leticia, Leal

4104 Martin Luther King Blvd

Houston, TX 77204

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketWrit Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Barnett, Jerome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Barnett, Jerome; Parties Against: LeBlanc, Karnell; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.0000%; Judgment Amount: $3919.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Barnett, Jerome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leticia, Leal