Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/18/2021 at 15:42:15 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC vs. Jehovany Sosa

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Jefferson Capital Systems LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jehovany Sosa. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3913

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems LLC

Defendant

Sosa, Jehovany

Houston, TX 77025

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collins, Nathan

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011-5220

Other Attorneys

Scott, Michael J

Stephens, Thomas W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketBusiness Record Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer Due

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Jefferson Capital Systems LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Michael J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Stephens