This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/22/2022 at 23:52:05 (UTC).

Jani Group LLC vs. William Corbin

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Jani Group LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against William Corbin. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7799

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jani Group LLC

1246 Lorraine St Ste A

Houston, TX 77009

Defendant

Corbin, William

Houston, TX 77093

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Thu Sep 30 15:00:00 CDT 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Jani Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less