This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/20/2022 at 03:04:56 (UTC).

Jani Group LLC vs. Isiaiah Clayborne

Case Summary

On 12/22/2021 Jani Group LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Isiaiah Clayborne. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2557

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jani Group LLC

1246 Lorraine St. Ste. A

Houston, TX 77009

Defendant

Clayborne, Isiaiah

Houston, TX 77091

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss without Prejudice for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Jani Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less