This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/16/2023 at 05:17:00 (UTC).

Jani Group LLC vs. Andrea Castaneda

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Jani Group LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Andrea Castaneda. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9846

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jani Group LLC

1246 Lorraine St Ste A

Houston, TX 77009

Defendant

Castaneda, Andrea

Houston, TX 77026

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Judgment/Disposition Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Jani Group LLC; Parties Against: Castaneda, Andrea; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.0000%; Judgment Amount: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder-Final Judgment Judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Jani Group LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JANI GROUP, LLC is a litigant