Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/30/2018 at 13:23:12 (UTC).

Integras Capital Recovery Llc vs. Daniel Mata

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 Integras Capital Recovery Llc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Daniel Mata. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4143

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 1, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Integras Capital Recovery Llc

Defendant

Mata, Daniel

Houston, TX 77093-3208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adams, Michael J

10004 Wurzbach Road # 292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Adams, Michael Jason

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2017
  • Order-Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Notice-Default Judgment 503.1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Motion for Default Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Debt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Integras Capital Recovery Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Integras Capital Recovery Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Judgment: Parties For: Integras Capital Recovery Llc; Parties Against: Mata, Daniel; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.0000%; Judgment Amount: $1283.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Disposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integras Capital Recovery Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MICHAEL JASON