This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 09/20/2022 at 04:28:06 (UTC).

INTEGRAS CAPITAL RECOVERY LLC vs. Bria Nelson

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 INTEGRAS CAPITAL RECOVERY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bria Nelson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2314

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTEGRAS CAPITAL RECOVERY LLC

Defendant

Nelson, Bria

Houston, TX 77083

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adams, Michael J

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Adams, Michael Jason

10004 Wurzbach Rd #292

San Antonio, TX 78230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $33.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: INTEGRAS CAPITAL RECOVERY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integras Capital Recovery Llc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MICHAEL JASON