Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/31/2021 at 04:09:28 (UTC).

Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company vs. Adelfo Salinas Basa, Greater Houston Transportation Company

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Adelfo Salinas Basa, Greater Houston Transportation Company. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1591

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

Greater Houston Transportation Company

Basa, Adelfo Salinas

Houston, TX 77084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cockrell, Catherine L

2777 Allen Parkway, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77019

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Basa, Adelfo Salinas and others; Parties Against: Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $71.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Infinity County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Greater Houston Transportation Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cockrell, Catherine L