This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/21/2022 at 06:19:09 (UTC).

In Re:Shelby Sheehan

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 In Re Shelby Sheehan was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5356

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Sheehan, Shelby

Respondents and Defendants

Baytown Police Department

Baytown Auto Storage

Baytown Wrecker Service

Interested Party

The Bar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryan, Travis Allan

Defendant Attorney

Mapes, Jerris Penrod

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/27/2021

HearingDescription: Tow Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DispositionDisposition: Probable Cause Found (OCA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketProbable Cause Found

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2021

DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2021

DocketMotion for Continuance Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2021

FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Sheehan, Shelby

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021

DocketRequest for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2021

DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

[+] Read More [-] Read Less