Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/21/2018 at 13:01:50 (UTC).

In Re:Rosa Acosta

Case Summary

On 08/06/2015 In Re Rosa Acosta was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7628

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ACOSTA, ROSA

Houston, TX 77089

Defendants

WILLOWCREEK APARTMENTS

7575 Office City Dr

Houston, TX 77012

Realty Center Management, Inc - Willow Creek Apartments (Nere Rivera, Property Manager)

7575 Office City Drive

Houston, TX 77012

Interested Parties and Respondents

Realty Center Management, Inc - Willow Creek Apartments (Nere R Vera, Property Manager)

Realty Center Management, Inc - Willow Creek Apartments (Thomas Polich, President)

Houston Central Auto Storage Inc (Samir Bakdounes, President)

Right Way Towing (Angel Jose Gonzales, Owner)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • Non-Certified Copy Requested Civil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Payment Information: Amount: $1.50; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Right Way Towing (Angel Jose Gonzales, Owner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Payment Information: Amount: $1.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Right Way Towing (Angel Jose Gonzales, Owner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Acosta, Rosa; Parties Against: Houston Central Auto Storage Inc and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Realty Center Management, Inc - Willow Creek Apartments (Nere R Vera, Property Manager) is a litigant

Latest cases where Houston Central Auto Storage Inc is a litigant