Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/17/2021 at 04:07:10 (UTC).

In Re:Robin Hilton- 2005 Nissan Altima License No.NBH9426 TX

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 In Re Robin Hilton- 2005 Nissan Altima License No NBH9426 TX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5348

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Hilton, Robin

Houston, TX 77093

Defendant and Respondent

Redwood Heights

Houston, TX 77093

Interested Parties

Space City Towing

North Freeway Auto Storage

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment from Justice Court-Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketProbable Cause Not Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketOrder-Tow Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Hilton, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Space City Towing is a litigant

Latest cases where North Freeway Auto Storage is a litigant