Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/25/2021 at 03:24:08 (UTC).

In Re:Puck Brown Tan Male 70 lbs Born 07/11/20

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 In Re Puck Brown Tan Male 70 lbs Born 07/11/20 was filed as an Other - Dangerous Animal lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0561

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Dangerous Animal

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In Re:

Defendant

Puck Brown Tan Male 70 lbs Born

Not Classified By Court

Grubb, Rachel

Mueller, Scott

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Milligan, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • HearingHearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Negative Finding (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice-Trial Setting 503.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNegative Finding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDetermination of Dangerous Dog

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketExhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketLetter of Representation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCitation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less