This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 19:49:26 (UTC).

In Re:Michele J. Grisby 2009 Nissan Rouge License Plate: MHR5040 TX

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 In Re Michele J Grisby 2009 Nissan Rouge License Plate MHR5040 TX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9068

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

Grisby, Michele J.

Houston, TX 77028

Respondents and Defendants

Houston Police Department

1200 Travis St

Houston, TX 77002

Rollingwood Apartments

670 Maxey Rd

Houston, TX 77013

Interested Parties

Southeast Houston Auto Storage

H Town Towing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingDescription: Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketProbable Cause Not Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOrder-Tow Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Fri Dec 04 09:00:00 CST 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Mon Mar 30 09:00:00 CDT 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Grisby, Michele J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southeast Houston Auto Storage is a litigant

Latest cases where ROLLINGWOOD APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where H Town Towing is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant