This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:01:04 (UTC).

In Re:Kody Hooper 2010 Hyundai Elantra License Plate: LTL9684 TX

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 In Re Kody Hooper 2010 Hyundai Elantra License Plate LTL9684 TX was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9473

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Hooper, Kody

Houston, TX 77096

Defendant and Respondent

McDonalds

1302 Westheimer

Houston, TX 77063

Interested Parties

Zone One Auto Storage

Parking Management Company

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment from Justice Court-Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • HearingDescription: Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketProbable Cause Not Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder-Tow Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Hooper, Kody

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McDonalds (Mercedes Diaz) is a litigant

Latest cases where Zone One Auto Storage is a litigant

Latest cases where Parking Management Company is a litigant