This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 20:24:11 (UTC).

In Re:Emmanuel Onwukamuche 2007 Toyota Camry License Plate No.LFK-2395

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 In Re Emmanuel Onwukamuche 2007 Toyota Camry License Plate No LFK-2395 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 6, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0308

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Onwukamuche, Emmanuel

Missouri City, TX 77459

Defendant and Respondent

Private Property Tow

2401 Westwridge St.

Houston, TX 77054

Interested Parties

Classic Towing

Holmes Rd Storage

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment from Justice Court-Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingDescription: Tow Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProbable Cause Not Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketOrder-Tow Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingHearing: Tow Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Other; Hearing Result/Cancellation Date: Mon Mar 30 09:00:00 CDT 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Money Order; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Onwukamuche, Emmanuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Private Property Tow LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Holmes Rd Storage is a litigant

Latest cases where classic towing is a litigant