Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/19/2018 at 13:42:56 (UTC).

In Re: Surya Uralil

Case Summary

On 10/14/2015 In Re Surya Uralil was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8848

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

URALIL, SURYA

Houston, TX 77054

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

CITY OF HOUSTON AND CITY OF HOUSTON PARKING MANAGEMENT DIVISION (MARIA IRSHAD - ASSISTANT DIRECTOR)

Houston, TX 77003

City of Houston and City of Houston Parking Management Division (Paul Dugas, Division Manager)

Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Fast Tow & Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President)

Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Uralil, Surya; Parties Against: Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Fast Tow & Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President) is a litigant