Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 14:13:37 (UTC).

In Re: Stephanie Plitt

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 In Re Stephanie Plitt was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4946

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PLITT, STEPHANIE

Spring, TX 77386

Defendant, Interested Party and Respondent

BOOT MAN, INC DBA PREMIER PARKING ENFORCEMENT (CHRISTOPHER A. CONFER, REGISTERED AGENT)

2420 Louisiana Suite 2

Houston, TX 77006

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Plitt, Stephanie; Parties Against: Boot Man, Inc Dba Premier Parking Enforcement (Christopher A. Confer, Registered Agent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boot Man Inc d/b/a Premier Parking Enforcement is a litigant