Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/18/2018 at 12:51:55 (UTC).

In Re: Sammie Signboy

Case Summary

On 09/09/2015 In Re Sammie Signboy was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8282

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SIGNBOY, SAMMIE

Houston, TX 77035

Defendants and Respondents

City of Houston - Houston Police Department (Randy Zamora, Division Chief, Criminal Law Division)

Houston, TX 77002

City of Houston - Houston Police Department

Houston, TX 77002

Interested Parties

CITY OF HOUSTON - HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT (KRISTIE LEWIS, STAFF ATTORNEY)

Houston, TX 77002

Minetta Auto Storage Llc (Octavian Rahaian, Jr., Partner)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Bruce, Jonathan Evan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Conversion Judgment Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Signboy, Sammie; Parties Against: Minetta Auto Storage Llc (Octavian Rahanian, Jr, Partner) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUCE, JONATHAN E