This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/14/2018 at 13:45:45 (UTC).

In Re: Robert Tara

Case Summary

On 12/16/2014 In Re Robert Tara was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3429

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TARA, ROBERT

Houston, TX 77077

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

MARQUIS ON ELDRIDGE

Houston, TX 77077

Cws Apartment Homes Llc - Marquis at Eldridge Parkway (Allison Woodall, Property Manager)

2250 Eldridge Parkway

Houston, TX 77077

H-Town Towing Llc (Dan Perry, Owner)

Cws Apartment Homes Llc - Marquis at Eldridge Parkway (Sue Mills, Registered Agent)

K.T.L Enterprises, Inc Dba K T L Auto Storage (Ken W. Ulmer, President)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Tara, Robert; Parties Against: Cws Apartment Homes Llc - Marq On Voss Apartments (Sue Mills, Registered Agent) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H Town Towing is a litigant

Latest cases where KTL ENTERPRISES, INC is a litigant