Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/16/2018 at 13:30:46 (UTC).

In Re: Lawerence Green

Case Summary

On 06/29/2015 In Re Lawerence Green was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6928

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GREEN, LAWERENCE

Houston, TX 77039

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

PARKING LOT ENFORCEMENT, INC (EMILY M. GILBERT, PRESIDENT) 1500 LUBBOCK PARKING LOT ENFORCEMENT

3541 West Dallas

Houston, TX 77019

H-Town Towing, Llc (Dan Perry, Owner)

Parking Lot Enforcement, Inc (Ngac David Nguyen, Registered Agent) 1500 Lubbock Parking Lot Enforcement

Metro Vehicle Storage Dba Metro Auto Storage (Ebf Auto, Partner)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Green, Lawerence; Parties Against: Metro Vehicle Storage Dba Metro Auto Storage (Ebf Auto, Partner) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metro Vehicle Storage Dba Metro Auto Storage (Ebf Auto, Partner) is a litigant

Latest cases where H Town Towing is a litigant