Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 13:27:01 (UTC).

In Re: Israel Camacho, Jr.

Case Summary

On 10/16/2015 In Re Israel Camacho, Jr was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8918

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Camacho, Israel M, Jr.

Houston, TX 77015

Defendant and Respondent

Pars Properties, Inc. - Royal Lake Mobile Home Park (Property Manager)

11800 Suburban

Houston, TX 77050

Interested Parties

Parking & Towing Experts Inc (Agustin Arturo Martinez, Manager)

Pars Properties, Inc. - Royal Lake Mobile Home Park (L. Karbalai, President)

North Freeway Auto Storage & Sales, Inc (Dan C. McMillan, Jr., President)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Camacho, Israel M, Jr.; Parties Against: Parking & Towing Experts, Inc (Agustin Arturo Martinez, Manager) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Parking & Towing Experts Inc (Agustin Arturo Martinez, Manager) is a litigant

Latest cases where North Freeway Auto Storage is a litigant