Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 14:43:18 (UTC).

In Re: Fredrick Moore

Case Summary

On 11/13/2015 In Re Fredrick Moore was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9304

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MOORE, FREDRICK LEE

Cypress, TX 77433

Defendants and Respondents

City of Houston - Houston Police Department (Randy Zamora, Division Chief, Criminal Law Division)

Houston, TX 77002

City of Houston - Houston Police Department

Houston, TX 77002

Interested Parties

BODY SHOP AUTO STORAGE (SUBHI H. ABUHAMRA, OWNER)

8210 Pinemont Drive

Houston, TX 77040

Faris Salman Dba Hy-Tech Towing & Recovery (Faris Salman, Owner)

City of Houston - Houston Police Department (Kristie Lewis, Staff Attorney)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Probable Cause Not Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Moore, Fredrick Lee; Parties Against: City of Houston - Houston Police Department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Body Shop Auto Storage is a litigant