Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/17/2018 at 14:15:44 (UTC).

In Re: Dianna Gittelman

Case Summary

On 06/23/2015 In Re Dianna Gittelman was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6883

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GITTELMAN, DIANNA

Houston, TX 77027

Defendants

City of Houston - Houston Police Department (Randy Zamora, Division Chief, Criminal Law Division)

Houston, TX 77002

City of Houston - Houston Police Department

Houston, TX 77002

Interested Parties and Respondents

CITY OF HOUSTON - HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT (KRISTIE LEWIS, STAFF ATTORNEY)

Houston, TX 77002

Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Fast Tow & Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President)

Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Notice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Military Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Gittelman, Dianna; Parties Against: Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milam St. Auto Storage, Inc Dba Fast Tow & Zone One Auto Storage (Jeanette Rash, President) is a litigant