Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/20/2018 at 13:59:24 (UTC).

In Re: Deborah Filip

Case Summary

On 07/29/2015 In Re Deborah Filip was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7512

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FILIP, DEBORAH

Houston, TX 77005

Defendants

City of Houston - Houston Police Department (Randy Zamora, Division Chief, Criminal Law Division)

Houston, TX 77002

City of Houston - Houston Police Department

Houston, TX 77002

Interested Parties and Respondents

CITY OF HOUSTON - HOUSTON POLICE DEPARTMENT (KRISTIE LEWIS, STAFF ATTORNEY)

Houston, TX 77002

Metro Vehicle Storage Dba Metro Auto Storage (Ebf Auto, Partner)

Stor'n Texas Inc Dba Zone 5 Auto Tow (Ismail Elchurafa, Manager)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Filip, Deborah; Parties Against: Metro Vehicle Storage Dba Metro Auto Storage (Ebf Auto, Partner) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2015
  • Disposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metro Vehicle Storage Dba Metro Auto Storage (Ebf Auto, Partner) is a litigant