Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/22/2018 at 12:38:55 (UTC).

In Re: Beverly Hollingquest

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 In Re Beverly Hollingquest was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9627

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HOLLINGQUEST, BEVERLY

Houston, TX 77061

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

VISTA VERDE APARTMENTS

8601 Broadway Street

Houston, TX 77061

Monument Real Estate Services Llc - Vista Verde Apartments (Holly Lubelski, Property Manager)

8601 Broadway Street

Houston, TX 77061

Interested Parties and Respondents

Judith Asaf Dba Intown Wrecker Service (Judith Alizeth Asaf, Owner)

Monument Real Estate Services Llc - Vista Verde Apartments (Holly Lubelski, Property Manager)

8601 Broadway Street

Houston, TX 77061

Houston Central Auto Storage Inc (Samir Bakdounes, President)

Monument Real Estate Services Llc - Vista Verde Apartments (Stuart Zook, President)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2016
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Judgment: Parties For: Hollingquest, Beverly; Parties Against: Monument Real Estate Services Llc - La Esencia Apartments (Stuart Zook, President) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Houston Central Auto Storage Inc is a litigant