Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/17/2018 at 14:00:12 (UTC).

In Re: Beth Allen

Case Summary

On 04/24/2015 In Re Beth Allen was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5686

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ALLEN, BETH W

Houston, TX 77096

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

KIRBY PLAZA

Houston, TX 77098

Levcor, Inc - Kirby-Richmond Plaza (Herbert L. Levine, President)

1001 West Loop South Suite 600

Houston, TX 77027

Bab Group Investments, Llc Dba Ronda Lane Auto Storage (Nancy Brand, President)

Mega Interests Towing, Ltd Dba Jet Wrecker Service (Jet Heavy Towing, Llc, Partner)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2015
  • Order-Granting Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Motion for Continuance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Allen, Beth W; Parties Against: Levcor, Inc - Kirby-Richmond Plaza (Herbert L. Levine, President)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less