This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/14/2018 at 13:23:24 (UTC).

In Re: Aurbrey Walker

Case Summary

On 12/10/2014 In Re Aurbrey Walker was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3201

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WALKER, AURBREY

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant and Interested Party

City View Place Apartments (Liz Pedraza, Property Manager)

16818 City View Place

Houston, TX 77060

Respondent

CITYVIEW PLACE APARTMENTS (LIZ PEDRAZA, PROPERTY MANAGER)

16818 City View Place

Houston, TX 77060

Interested Parties

Zone 2 Auto Storage, Inc (Akram Alkhatib, President)

Tarantino Properties, Inc - City View Place Apartments (Anthony Tarantino, President)

Hc Towing Inc Dba Harris County Writ (John McUllough, Owner)

Tarantino Properties, Inc - Cityview Place Apartments (Anthony Tarantino, President)

City View Place Apartments (Liz Pedraza, Property Manager)

16818 City View Place

Houston, TX 77060

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • Notice-Tow or Boot Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Walker, Aurbrey; Parties Against: City View Place Apartments (Liz Pedraza, Property Manager)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zone 2 Auto Storage, Inc (Akram Alkhatib, President) is a litigant

Latest cases where TARANTINO PROPERTIES INC is a litigant