Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/19/2018 at 13:44:45 (UTC).

In Re: Antonio Matos

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 In Re Antonio Matos was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7570

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MATOS, ANTONIO

Houston, TX 77007

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

2100 MEMORIAL APARTMENTS

2100 Memorial Dr

Houston, TX 77007

The Lynd Company - 2100 Memorial (Emily Kruep, Property Manager)

2100 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77007

Johnny R. Scott Dba Pd Towing of Houston (Johnny R. Scott, Owner)

The Lynd Company - 2100 Memorial (Michael J. Lynd, President)

North Freeway Auto Storage & Sales, Inc (Dan C. McMillan, Jr., President)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Matos, Antonio; Parties Against: North Freeway Auto Storage and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where North Freeway Auto Storage is a litigant