Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/18/2018 at 13:24:00 (UTC).

In Re: Annett Williams

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 In Re Annett Williams was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7580

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WILLIAMS, ANNETT

Houston, TX 77088

Defendants, Interested Parties and Respondents

RETREAT ON ROSYLN APARTMENTS

5801 N Rosslyn

Houston, TX 77091

Retreat On Rosslyn (Ally Lozano, Property Manager)

Houston, TX 77091

Bryan K Parker Dba Return to Sender Towing and Recovery (Bryan K. Parker, Owner)

American Eagle Auto Storage (Shaban Kh-Ziedeh, Owner)

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • Notice-Tow Hearing Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Probable Cause Found

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Pending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Request for Tow or Boot Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Hearing: Judge Trial; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Williams, Annett; Parties Against: American Eagle Auto Storage (Shaban Kh-Ziedeh, Owner) and others

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Eagle Auto Storage is a litigant