This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 11:51:50 (UTC).

Gregory Pittman, Taseana L Rufus vs. Sharon Rhodes, Rick Furr

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 Gregory Pittman, Taseana L Rufus filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sharon Rhodes, Rick Furr. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3750

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Rufus, Taseana L

Houston, TX 77072

Pittman, Gregory

Houston, TX 77072

Rutus, Taseana

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Furr, Rick

Katy, TX 77449

Rhodes, Sharon

Katy, TX 77449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

McClure, Colleen M

4201 Cypress Creek Parkway Suite 565

Houston, TX 77068

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Counter Claim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Answer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Service Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Request for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Order-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Small Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $68.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Rhodes, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Payment Information: Amount: $194.00; Payment Type: Cash; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Pittman, Gregory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Event: Judge Trial; Completion Date: Wed Apr 25 09:00:00 CDT 2018

    Read MoreRead Less