Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/19/2018 at 15:02:27 (UTC).

Green Acres vs. Betty Smith, Ronnie Robertson

Case Summary

On 08/04/2015 Green Acres filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Betty Smith, Ronnie Robertson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7573

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREEN ACRES

Houston, TX 77047

Defendants

SMITH, BETTY

Houston, TX 77047

ROBERTSON, RONNIE

Houston, TX 77047

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2015
  • Pending

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Order-Final Judgment Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Eviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Exhibit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Eviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Consent for Email Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Hearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Green Acres; Parties Against: Smith, Betty and others; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $493.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less