This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/23/2022 at 05:14:20 (UTC).

Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College Districtvs.SUNBELT RENTALS INC.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College Districtvs SUNBELT RENTALS INC was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8149

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College District

City of Baytown

Defendant

SUNBELT RENTALS INC.

1999 Bryan Street Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benoit, Brandon E

Po Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522-0809

Strong, Randall B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $54.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College District

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMotion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benoit, Brandon E