This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/23/2022 at 05:14:16 (UTC).

Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College Districtvs.GREEN APPLE SALON LLC

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College Districtvs GREEN APPLE SALON LLC was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8139

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

Goose Creek Consolidated Independent School District and Lee College District

City of Baytown

Defendant

GREEN APPLE SALON LLC

650 W Texas Ave

Baytown, TX 77521

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benoit, Brandon E

Po Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522-0809

Strong, Randall B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOOSE CREEK CONSOLIDATED ISD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benoit, Brandon E