This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/07/2020 at 03:22:57 (UTC).

Good Games Investments vs. La Rosa Blanca Mexican Resturant

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Good Games Investments filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against La Rosa Blanca Mexican Resturant. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6188

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Good Games Investments

10300 Katy Frwy Suite 547

Houston, TX 77043

Defendant

La Rosa Blanca Mexican Resturant

Houston, TX 77009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Good Games Investments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less