This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 08/07/2020 at 03:23:06 (UTC).

Good Games Investments vs. Jace Auto LLC

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Good Games Investments filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jace Auto LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6184

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 5, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Good Games Investments

10300 Katy Frwy Suite 547

Houston, TX 77043

Defendant

Jace Auto LLC

5829 W Sam Houston Pkwy N Suite 1105

Houston, TX 77041

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingDescription: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingHearing: Judge Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Good Games Investments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less