Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 06/03/2020 at 03:05:37 (UTC).

Glf Housing Llc vs. Edgar Barajas-Vega

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Glf Housing Llc filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Edgar Barajas-Vega. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3464

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 7, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Llc, Glf Housing

110 Avenue B Suite 100 N/A

Stafford, TX 77477

Defendant

Barajas-Vega, Edgar

Houston, TX 77033

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Llc, Glf Housing

110 Avenue B Suite 100 N/A

Stafford, TX 77477

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketEviction Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $121.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Llc, Glf Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less