This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/30/2023 at 03:09:08 (UTC).

GCCISD & Lee College Districtvs.Houston Controls, Inc., UPS Instrument & Electrical Services LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 GCCISD Lee College Districtvs Houston Controls, Inc , UPS Instrument Electrical Services LLC was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1255

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

GCCISD & Lee College District

City of Baytown

Defendants

Houston Controls, Inc.

UPS Instrument & Electrical Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benoit, Brandon E

Strong, Randall B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $54.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: GCCISD & Lee College District

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketOrder Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketMotion Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $54.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: City of Baytown

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less