This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/02/2022 at 05:11:08 (UTC).

GCCISD & Lee College Districtvs.TEXAS MM LLC, TEXAS MM LLC DBA SPACE CITY BAR & LOUNGE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 GCCISD Lee College Districtvs TEXAS MM LLC, TEXAS MM LLC DBA SPACE CITY BAR LOUNGE was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0451

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Intervenors

GCCISD & Lee College District

City of Baytown

Defendants

TEXAS MM LLC

7447 Eastpoint Blvd, Apt. #10104

Baytown, TX 77521

TEXAS MM LLC DBA SPACE CITY BAR & LOUNGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benoit, Brandon E

Po Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522-0809

Strong, Randall B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketOther Documents Not Listed - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCCISD & Lee College District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benoit, Brandon E