This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/24/2022 at 05:11:08 (UTC).

GCCISD & Lee College Districtvs.Breitling Royalties Corporation, Thomas L Taylor (IN REM ONLY), III, Dusty Rodriguez, Tamra Freedman, Parker Hallam

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 GCCISD Lee College Districtvs Breitling Royalties Corporation, Thomas L Taylor IN REM ONLY , III, Dusty Rodriguez, Tamra Freedman, Parker Hallam was filed as a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 3, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8707

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GCCISD & Lee College District

Defendants

Breitling Royalties Corporation

Hallam, Parker

Taylor (IN REM ONLY), Thomas L, III

Rodriguez, Dusty

Freedman, Tamra

Intervenor

City of Baytown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benoit, Brandon E

Po Box 809

Baytown, TX 77522-0809

Other Attorneys

Strong, Randall B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Non-suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOrder-Dismiss wo Prejudice on Nonsuit or Plaintiff's Mot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketOrder Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims-Tax Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPetition in Intervention Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GCCISD & Lee College District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strong, Randall B