This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/01/2023 at 04:17:44 (UTC).

Gammage Duval Realty Associates vs. Maria Victoria Orosco, All Other Occupants

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Gammage Duval Realty Associates filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Maria Victoria Orosco, All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 6, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5004

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gammage Duval Realty Associates

Defendant

Maria Victoria Orosco, All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77087

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Huynh, Tom Q

7670 Woodway Dr Ste 342

Houston, TX 77062

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketWrit Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Gammage Duval Realty Associates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • HearingHearing: Eviction Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • JudgementJudgment: Parties For: Gammage Duval Realty Associates; Parties Against: Maria Victoria Orosco, All Other Occupants; Post-Judgment Interest: 7.0000%; Judgment Amount: $0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketOrder-Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice-Default Judgment 503.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $108.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Gammage Duval Realty Associates

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketAdditional Documents Filed by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less