Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 07/18/2021 at 05:11:38 (UTC).

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC vs. Steven Taylor

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven Taylor. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9150

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

Defendant

Taylor, Steven

Spring, TX 77373

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Addison, Brandi

15660 N Dallas Parkway Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75248

Defendant Attorney

Fernandez, David A

2190 N Loop West Suite 333

Houston, TX 77018

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDebt Claim-Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Galaxy International Purchasing, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi Marie Addison