This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 02/16/2017 at 03:06:51 (UTC).

Francisca Juarez vs. Sandra Lopez

Case Summary

On 05/07/2012 Francisca Juarez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sandra Lopez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4724

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juarez, Francisca

Defendant

Lopez, Sandra

Counter Plaintiff

Castillo, Sandra Luz Lopez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Corno, Daniel Jason

4214 Old Arbor Way

Humble, TX 77346

Defendant Attorney

Vaquerano, Soledad R

704 Pasadena

Pasadena, TX 77506

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketDismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • DocketCitation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Dismissed; Completion Date: Thu Apr 25 09:00:00 CDT 2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Feb 21 09:00:00 CST 2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Jan 15 09:00:00 CST 2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Nov 20 09:00:00 CST 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Oct 16 09:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2012
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Tue Sep 11 09:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • DocketEvent: Judge Trial; Completion: Reset; Completion Date: Thu Jul 05 09:00:00 CDT 2012

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Juarez, Francisca; Parties Against: Lopez, Sandra

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • DocketDisposition: All Other Dispositions (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORNO, DANIEL