This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/10/2018 at 02:54:46 (UTC).

Famsa Inc vs. America Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 06/23/2017 Famsa Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against America Gonzalez. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 7, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1089

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Famsa Inc

Defendant

Gonzalez, America

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2017

DocketAnswer Due

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2017

DocketService Return

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2017

DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2017

DocketRequest for Alternative Service Rule 501.2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2017

DocketDebt Claim-Citation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2017

DocketCitation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2017

DocketOriginal Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2017

DocketPayment Information: Amount: $44.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Famsa Inc

[+] Read More [-] Read Less