This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 01/24/2023 at 00:30:28 (UTC).

Fairfield Block 334 LP dba Block 334 vs. Mila Thomas

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Fairfield Block 334 LP dba Block 334 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mila Thomas. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9772

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fairfield Block 334 LP dba Block 334

6300 La Calma Dr, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendant

Thomas, Mila

Houston, TX 77002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketTranscript of Judgment from Justice Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $130.00; Payment Type: Mastercard/Visa Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Fairfield Block 334 LP dba Block 334

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketEviction-Writ of Possession-Efile

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEviction-Statement of Inability to Pay at Appeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEviction-Notice Tenant Filing Statement of Inability Pay App

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEviction-Notice Filing Statement Inability Pay Apl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAppeal Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketService Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEviction-Request for Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEviction-Order Authorizing Alternative Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $129.00; Payment Type: Check; Transaction Type: Payment; Receipt Description: Payment; Payor Name: Fairfield Block 334 LP dba Block 334

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice-Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction-Citation Possession and Back Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEviction Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fairfield Block 334 LP dba Block 334 is a litigant