Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/21/2018 at 13:21:58 (UTC).

Ex Parte

Case Summary

On 04/01/2015 Ex Parte was filed as a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5170

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 2, Place 2

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EX PARTE

Defendant

RICHARDSON, SCOTT

Houston, TX 77077

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MORGAN, RONALD M

5610 Southwest Freeway Suite 104

Houston, TX 77057

Morgan, Ronald

5610 Southwest Frwy Ste 104

Houston, TX 77057

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2015
  • Order-Occupational Driver's License Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • Amended Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Order-Occupational Driver's License Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Occupational Drivers License Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Original Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Notice-Hearing on Petition for Occupational DL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2015
  • Conversion Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • Hearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Hearing: Hearing; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Judgment: Parties For: Ex Parte; Parties Against: Richardson, Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • Disposition: Trial or Hearing by Judge (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan, Ronald