This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 12/26/2018 at 14:58:35 (UTC).

Energy Capital Credit Union vs. Lynell Jones Jackson

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 Energy Capital Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lynell Jones Jackson. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice of the Peace for Precinct 1, Place 2 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8925

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENERGY CAPITAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

JACKSON, LYNELL JONES

Not Classified By Court

Kovach, James Fredrick

Receiver

Collins, Samuel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kovach, James F

170 Westcott Street

Houston, TX 77007

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketReceivers Bond Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketAnswer Due

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketOrder-Authorizing Alternative Service 501.2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketConversion Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketHearing: Motion Docket; Hearing Result/Cancellation: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketJudgment: Parties For: Energy Capital Credit Union; Parties Against: Jackson, Lynell Jones; Post-Judgment Interest: 5.00%; Judgment Amount: $1672.41

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketDisposition: Default Judgment (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Energy Capital Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kovach, James F