Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Justice Courts on 03/17/2021 at 04:16:36 (UTC).

Electra Link Inc vs. Basic Energy Services Inc

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Electra Link Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Basic Energy Services Inc. This case was filed in Harris County Justice Courts, Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1 located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5827

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Harris County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Justice Of The Peace For Precinct 4, Place 1

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Electra Link Inc

Defendants

Basic Energy Services

801 Cherry Street Unit 21

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Basic Energy Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lara, Megan M

21755 Interstate Hwy 45 #10

Spring, TX 77388

Defendant Attorney

Dore, Brent R

17171 Park Row Suite 160

Houston, TX 77084

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims-Amended Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketPending Judge Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAmended Filing - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketService Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims-Citation Money Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCitation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • FinancialPayment Information: Amount: $49.00; Payment Type: American Express Efile (Remote); Transaction Type: Remote Payments; Receipt Description: Remote Payments; Payor Name: Electra Link Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Efile

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Electra Link Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Basic Energy Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent R. Dore